This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 14:06:56 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS RUIZ

Case Summary

On 11/17/2016 LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RUIZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Tafoya, Robert S. and Wolf, David E.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0321

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delano / Mcfarland Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Tafoya, Robert S.

Wolf, David E.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOBEL FINANCIAL

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

RUIZ, MARK

RUIZ, MANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LOBEL, GARY D

GREEN, RONALD J, Jr.

HUANG, SHIAO-WEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketWrit Returned Partially Satisfied - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Wolf, David E.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketMemorandum of Credits, Interest and Costs Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Awarded Against: RUIZ, MANUEL; Amount; Damages: $3,777.74; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 22.95 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $400.53; Attorney Fees: $380.00; Costs: $355.00; Total: $4913.27; Party: Names: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; RUIZ, MANUEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketDeclaration in Lieu of Testimony Filed - Comment: Accepting copies in lieu of the originals.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice, as to does 1 to 10 only.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less