Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:14:58 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS VELAZQUEZ

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VELAZQUEZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1005

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

VELAZQUEZ, FREDI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUANG, SHIAO-WEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Awarded Against: VELAZQUEZ, FREDI; Amount; Damages: $2,974.25; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 22.95 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $306.68; Attorney Fees: $300.00; Costs: $325.00; Total: $3905.93

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: COUNTY OF KERN RETURNED VIA US MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs and Credits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • Original Promissory Note Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2015
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: of Dianne M Cravens PUrsuant to CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to Fredi Velazquez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to Does 1 to 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: personal, as to Fredi Velazquez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Fredi Valazquez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PREPAID ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SHIAO-WEN HUANG

    Read MoreRead Less