Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:20:34 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS THOMPSON ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against THOMPSON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1021

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

THOMPSON, FREDDIE

THOMPSON, JOCELYNNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUANG, SHIAO-WEN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Minute Order- Order to Show Cause CRC 3.740d --1/11/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MEMO, WRIT, NAMES OF DEBTORS DO NOT CONFORM TO THE JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Awarded Against: THOMPSON, JOCELYNNE; Amount; Damages: $5,053.02; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,130.98; Attorney Fees: $510.00; Costs: $415.00; Total: $7109.00; Party: Names: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; THOMPSON, JOCELYNNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • Writ of Execution Issued - Comment: OUNTY OF KERN/MONEY/DKR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Memorandum of Costs and Credits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: MEMO, WRIT, NAMES OF DEBTORS DO NOT CONFORM TO THE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA ENCLOSED ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Original Promissory Note Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2017
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to JOCELYNNE THOMPSON; signed by Linda S Etienne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: Pursuant to CCP 585d

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Minute Order- Order to Show Cause CRC 3.740d --1/11/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Ruling - Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Freddie Thompson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Jocelynne Thompson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PREPAID ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SHIAO-WEN HUANG

    Read MoreRead Less