This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:36:16 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS SMITH

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SMITH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Shafter / Wasco Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shayer, Steven and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0289

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Shafter / Wasco Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shayer, Steven

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

SMITH, ETOSHA SCHEREE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUANG, SHIAO-WEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: LOS ANGELES COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: SACRAMENTO COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer(s): Benavides, Jose R., Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Awarded Against: SMITH, ETOSHA SCHEREE; Amount; Damages: $5,553.68; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 20.00 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $966.72; Attorney Fees: $423.00; Costs: $280.00; Other: $0.00; Total: $7223.40; Party: Names: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; SMITH, ETOSHA SCHEREE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF SHILOY KRAUSE PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: OF SHILOY KRAUSE PER C.C.P. 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Served: 11/07/20177:41 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketStatement of Classification and Location

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less