Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 22:08:06 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ROBERSON JR

Case Summary

On 07/13/2015 LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ROBERSON JR. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bittleston, Dawn and Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1066

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bittleston, Dawn

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

ROBERSON JR, CALVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUANG, SHIAO-WEN

 

Court Documents

Claim of Exemption

06/30/16 MO: Claim of Exemption: Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to Calvin Roberson Jr; Parties Present Defendant: ROBERSON JR, CALVIN

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Awarded Against: ROBERSON JR, CALVIN; Amount; Damages: $4,996.61; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 21.22 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $368.30; Attorney Fees: $500.00; Costs: $280.00; Total: $6144.91

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Writ of Execution Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Memorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • Order Determining Claim of Exemption - Judicial Officer: Bittleston, Dawn; Comment: CERTIFIED COPY SENT TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Claim of Exemption - 06/30/16 MO: Claim of Exemption: Judicial Officer(s): Etienne, Linda S., Bittleston, Dawn; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: as to Calvin Roberson Jr; Parties Present Defendant: ROBERSON JR, CALVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • Original Claim of Exemption, Notice of Opposition and Notice - Comment: of Hearing from Levying Officer Sacramento County. Currentiy withholding $0. as to Calvin Roberson Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Confidential Statement - Comment: as to Calvin Roberson Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2016
  • Notice of Opposition/Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption - Comment: as to Calvin Roberson Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: Returned via mail

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: OF DIANNE M CRAVENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AS TO CALVIN ROBERSON, JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: substituted, as to CAlvin Roberson Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PREPAID ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SHIAO-WEN HUANG

    Read MoreRead Less