Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:14:46 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS PANTOJA

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PANTOJA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0999

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

PANTOJA, CESAR MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUANG, SHIAO-WEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Awarded Against: PANTOJA, CESAR MARTIN; Amount; Damages: $5,749.85; Pre-Judgment Interest: $934.08; Attorney Fees: $600.00; Costs: $295.00; Total: $7578.93; Party: Names: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; PANTOJA, CESAR MARTIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • Abstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Original Promissory Note Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to CESAR MARTIN PANTOJA; signed by Linda S Etienne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Declaration - Comment: Pursuant to CCP 585d

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Declaration of Compliance with CCP Section 1033 (B) (2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to CESAR MARTIN PANTOJA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: W/O Prejudice as to Does

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • Rejection/Correction Notice - Comment: TO GARY DEAN LOBEL: RETURNING REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT (NOT PROCESSED). YOUR COURT JUDGMENT CANNOT BE PROCESSED BECAUSE THE NAME ON THE ORIGINAL CONTRACT DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE COMPLAINT NOW PROOF OF SERVICE. PLEASE RETURN AFTER CORRECTION. THE PROOF OF SERVICE MAY NEED TO BE RE-SERVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: as to Cesar Martin Pantoja - Default Only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: substituted, as to Cesar Martin Pantoja

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PREPAID ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SHIAO-WEN HUANG

    Read MoreRead Less