This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 13:17:55 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS MEAD, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/04/2015 LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MEAD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Arvin / Lamont Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Witt, Gary R., Staley, H.A. "Skip" and Staley, H. A. "Skip". The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0120

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arvin / Lamont Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Witt, Gary R.

Staley, H.A. "Skip"

Staley, H. A. "Skip"

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

MEAD, ROBERT A

PRYOR, BILLIE J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUANG, SHIAO-WEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Staley, H. A. "Skip"; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Original Returned Via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Witt, Gary R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Awarded Against: MEAD, ROBERT A; PRYOR, BILLIE J; Amount; Damages: $2,402.69; Pre-Judgment Interest Rate: 22.95 %; Pre-Judgment Interest: $244.62; Attorney Fees: $240.00; Costs: $365.00; Total: $3252.31; Party: Names: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; MEAD, ROBERT A; PRYOR, BILLIE J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk - Comment: Total $3252.31 As to Robert A. Mead & Billie J. Pryor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Per C.C.P 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Pursuant to C.C.P. 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment: As to Robert A. Mead & Billie J. Pryor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Without Prejudice as to Does 1 to 10 only.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service as to Robert A. Mead

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail - Comment: As to Robert A. Mead

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence Filed - Comment: Attempted to Serve Robert A. Mead

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Personal Service as to Billie J. Pryor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Served: 12/22/201510:40 AM; Served: 12/22/201510:40 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Returned via SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less