Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:20:28 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS JUAREZ-ALVAREZ

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JUAREZ-ALVAREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1019

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

JUAREZ-ALVAREZ, LUIS FERNANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUANG, SHIAO-WEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Original Promissory Note Cancelled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2015
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: OF DIANNE M CRAVENS PURSUANT TO CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: OF DIANE M CRAVENS PER CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: AS TO LUIS FERNANDO JUAREZ-ALVAREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: AS TO DOES 1 TO 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: substituted, as to Luis Frernando Juarez-Alvarez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PREPAID ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SHIAO-WEN HUANG

    Read MoreRead Less