Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:20:31 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS FONCECA

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FONCECA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1020

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

FONCECA, SARAH

FONSECA, SARAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUANG, SHIAO-WEN

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d)

Minute Order- Order to Show Cause CRC 3.740d--1/11/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Cont'd from 1/11/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Minute Order- Order to Show Cause CRC 3.740d--1/11/16: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO SARAH FONCECA AKA SARAH FONSECA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO, SARAH FONCECA AKA SARAH FONSECA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Sarah Fonceca aka Sarah Fonseca

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PREPAID ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Notice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SHIAO-WEN HUANG

    Read MoreRead Less