Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:14:14 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS BARRERA

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BARRERA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1010

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

BARRERA, WENDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUANG, SHIAO-WEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: As to, Wendy Barrera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: As to, Wendy Barrera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2015
  • Declaration of Non-Service - Comment: as to Wendy Barrera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PREPAID ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10-26-2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY SHIAO-WEN HUANG CMC 1-11-2016 8:30 AM D12

    Read MoreRead Less