This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 14:40:35 (UTC).

LOANDEPOT.COM, LLC VS SEAMAN

Case Summary

On 12/24/2015 LOANDEPOT COM, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SEAMAN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0223

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LOANDEPOT.COM, LLC

IMORTGAGE

Defendant

SEAMAN, KIM M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OH, DONNA YEOWON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: LOANDEPOT.COM, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 637 Sherwood Court Ridgecrest, CA 93555; Judgment Applies to All Occupants; Awarded Against: SEAMAN, KIM M.; Party: Names: LOANDEPOT.COM, LLC; SEAMAN, KIM M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution Possession or - Comment: Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2016
  • DocketNon-Military Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: KIM M. SEAMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS c/o KIM M. SEAMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: OH, DONNA YEOWON, LOANDEPOT.COM, LLC; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.