This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:48:47 (UTC).

LIVINGSTON VS LIVINGSTON (C)

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 LIVINGSTON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LIVINGSTON C. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Fielder, John L., Gill, Susan M. and Stainfield, Bryan K.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1768

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Fielder, John L.

Gill, Susan M.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LIVINGSTON, ROBERT M

Respondent

LIVINGSTON, JENNA MAE K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HORRIGAN, GEORGE R

Respondent Attorney

GREENE, BENJAMIN R

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 10/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: LIVINGSTON, ROBERT M; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R; Respondent: LIVINGSTON, JENNA MAE K

Request for Order - Respondent

Request for Order - Respondent 06/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES C/C C/V C/S S/S 2 MINORS **SERVICE ISSUES**; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HORRIGAN, GEORGE R; Respondent: LIVINGSTON, JENNA MAE K; Attorney: GREENE, BENJAMIN R

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 05/19/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: RES FW FEES: $520.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: SIGNED PURSUANT TO C.C.P 635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 10/26/2017: Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • DocketNotice of Mandatory Settlement Conference/Trial Status - Comment: Conference Hearing Date: 10/26/17 Hearing Time: 9:00 AM Department/Division: MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketAt-Issue Memorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketFindings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: HRG 6/2/17

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG 06/02/17 DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: HRG 5/19/17 DIV C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: JENNA MAE K. LIVINGSTON New Attorney: BENJAMIN R. GREENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.