This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 21:11:59 (UTC).

LITTLE VS SUNRUN, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/29/2017 LITTLE filed an Other lawsuit against SUNRUN, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2304

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LITTLE, JEFFREY

Defendant

SUNRUN, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARTNEY, N. THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Non, Fast Track; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 04/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO SUNRUN, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA MCCARTNEY & ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/17/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.