This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:45:32 (UTC).

LITTLE VS LITTLE(B)

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 LITTLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LITTLE B. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cannon, Gloria. The case status is Other - Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1926

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cannon, Gloria

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LITTLE, BRADLEY JOHN

Respondent

LITTLE, SHERRIE LYNN

 

Court Documents

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 08/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 04/11/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONTD FROM 05/23/18

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 05/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 04/11/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: directed to Petitioner to show cause why the court should not impose Sanctions for failing to appear at the Family Centered Case Resolution hearing on 05/23/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 08/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 04/11/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR CONTD FROM 05/23/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 05/23/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 04/11/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: NOTICE OF HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 05/23/18 DIV B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less