This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 09/27/2023 at 08:55:54 (UTC).

LITTLE ET AL VS SINGH ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/13/2017 LITTLE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SINGH. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Clark, Thomas S., Friedman - Retired, Gary T. and Friedman, Gary T.. The case status is Pending - Appeal.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1322

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Appeal

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Clark, Thomas S.

Friedman - Retired, Gary T.

Friedman, Gary T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LITTLE, SUSAN

LITTLE, LAURENCE MITCHELL

Defendants

SINGH, DAVINDER

U.S. FREIGHT CARRIER LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WEGIS, RALPH B

ROWLEY, COURTNEY E

ROWLEY, NICHOLAS CHARLES

KAWAI, JOHN A

Defendant Attorney

LOWENTHAL, JOHN S

 

Court Documents

Motion to Compel

Motion to Compel 07/19/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/18/18; 6/19/18 re-notice Defendants, DAVINDER SINGH; US FREIGHT CARRIER, LLC Motion to Compel Production of Business Records ResID: 30945 ResID: 31199

Motion to Continue

Motion to Continue 08/06/2019: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 7/5/19 Defendants, DAVINDER SINGH; US FREIGHT CARRIER, LLC Motion to Continue Trial and all Trial Related Dates ResID: 35286

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proposed order rejected: Duplicate filing. Returned via efile

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Case Managemant statement rejected: Case Management hearing information is incomplete. Returned via efile

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Ex parte Application requires $60 fee. Returned via efile

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 11/20/2019: Judicial Officer(s): Friedman, Gary T., Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Result: Held

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further

Mandatory Settlement Conference - Further 01/22/2020: Judicial Officer: Friedman - Retired, Gary T.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONTINUED FROM 11/20

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Judge will be out on 7/02/2019. Motion needs to be re-noticed for a different date.

Ruling

Ruling 01/29/2020: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 01:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

04/08/2022: Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice (Appeals)

12/23/2021: Rejection/Correction Notice (Appeals)

Ruling 12/17/2021

12/17/2021: Ruling 12/17/2021

Rejection/Correction Notice (Appeals)

11/30/2021: Rejection/Correction Notice (Appeals)

Motion to Tax Costs 11/30/2021

11/30/2021: Motion to Tax Costs 11/30/2021

Rejection/Correction Notice

11/19/2021: Rejection/Correction Notice

DAY #12 Jury Trial 09/24/2021

09/24/2021: DAY #12 Jury Trial 09/24/2021

DAY #11 Jury Trial 09/23/2021

09/23/2021: DAY #11 Jury Trial 09/23/2021

DAY #10 Jury Trial 09/22/2021

09/22/2021: DAY #10 Jury Trial 09/22/2021

387 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2023
  • DocketService/Courtesy Copy Received; Comment: Answer to Petition for Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2023
  • DocketService/Courtesy Copy Received; Comment: Petition for Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • DocketOpinion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2023
  • DocketOpinion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketService/Courtesy Copy Received; Comment: Appellant's Reply Brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketNotice; Comment: Defendants' Davinder Singh and US Freight Carrier, LLC's Notice Designating Exhibits for Transmittal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketService/Courtesy Copy Received; Comment: Respondents' Brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketService/Courtesy Copy Received; Comment: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketService/Courtesy Copy Received; Comment: RESPONDENTS' BRIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketService/Courtesy Copy Received; Comment: Appellants' Opening Brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
400 More Docket Entries
  • 08/30/2017
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Comment: DOE NO.1 - U.S. FREIGHT CARRIER LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketNotice; Comment: Notice of Acknowledgment and Receipt Civil

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Proof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice; Comment: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT; ORDER PAGE DOES NOT CONTAIN ENOUGH INFORMATION REGARDING CASE; NEED AT LEAST THREE LINES OF TET WITH IDENTIFYING INFORMATION FOR ORDER AND CASE (SHORT TITLE CASE AND CASE NUMBER); PLEASE CORRECT, THEN RE-SUBMIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents; Served: 08/29/2017; Served: 09/11/2017; Served: 09/12/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: RETURNED VIA E-FILE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 9/26/17 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less