This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:46:35 (UTC).

LIM VS LIM(E)

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 LIM filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LIM E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L., Benavides, Jose R., McKnight, Ralph L., Jr. and Fielder, John L.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4610

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Benavides, Jose R.

McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.

Fielder, John L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LIM, SOMEY P

Respondent

LIM, PROS

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 06/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 03/21/17 PET C/S *TO BE HEARD IN DIV E -- DCSS NOT A PARTY TO THE CASE* ** PET 1ST CONTINUANCE FROM 04/25/17**; Parties Present Petitioner: LIM, SOMEY P; Respondent: LIM, PROS

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2017
  • Notice Re Payment of Support - Comment: FILED BY DCSS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Findings and Orders - Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Comment: HEARING: 6/9/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 06/09/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 03/21/17 PET C/S *TO BE HEARD IN DIV E -- DCSS NOT A PARTY TO THE CASE* ** PET 1ST CONTINUANCE FROM 04/25/17**; Parties Present Petitioner: LIM, SOMEY P; Respondent: LIM, PROS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2017
  • Proof of Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Request and Order to Continue Hearing and Extend Temporary - Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Comment: ***1ST CONTINUANCE***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Judicial Officer: McKnight, Ralph L., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: PET C/S 1 MINOR *DCSS NOT A PARTY TO THE CASE -- TO BE HEARD IN DIV E*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees - Comment: $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Request for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG:4/25/17 @: 8:30AM DIV:A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • Child Support Registry Received for Forwarding to SDU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • Judgment of Dissolution (Default) - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Comment: STATUS ENDS 4/23/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution (FL-170)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less