This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/05/2020 at 06:14:12 (UTC).

LIFE'S HEALING SOLUTIONS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS COUNTY OF KERN, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 LIFE'S HEALING SOLUTIONS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against COUNTY OF KERN, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1387

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIFE'S HEALING SOLUTIONS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

GREG FENTON, KERN COUNTY BUILDING OFFICIAL

COUNTY OF KERN, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

LORELEI H. OVIATT, KERN COUNTY PLANNING AND NATURAL RESOURCES DEPARTMENT

Not Classified By Court

Fifth District Court of Appeal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GODINEZ, GABRIEL A

MCCARTNEY, N. THOMAS

Defendant Attorney

JENKINS, PHILLIP T.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/03/2019 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 11

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:Gabriel Godinez; Re:Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Reason:Name of party served does not match the summons and complaint- needs correction on #3.a.; #5.b.(4) and (5) must be completed if substituted service; #6 needs correction.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:Gabriel Godinez; Re:Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Reason:Name of party served does not match the summons and complaint- needs correction on #3.a.; #3.b. (Person served on behalf of entity) should be completed with Person authorized to accept listed; #5.b.(4) must be completed if substituted service; #6 needs correction.

Ruling

Ruling 05/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition

Ex Parte Hearing - Pre-Disposition 05/23/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 5/21/2019 Life's Healing Solutions Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: GODINEZ, GABRIEL A

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Notice of Appeal: Cannot be filed electronically and must be filed with Appeals

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Substitution of Attorney: Missing page 2 of Mandatory Judicial Council Form MC-050

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing Remittitur

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketRemittitur on Appeal After Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketDemurrer - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: 09/03/2019 Defendants: COUNTY OF KERN; LORELEI H. OVIATT Notice of Demurrer ResID: 35777

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketLetter Received - Comment: Letter From: PHILLIP JENKINS Date of Letter: 10/3/19 Re: Letter to Court Clerk Requesting Demurrer be Taken off Calendar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: and proof of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketOrder from Fifth District Court of Appeal filed - Comment: Appellant having filed a request for dismissal of appeal, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeal in the above-entitled action is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:Gabriel Godinez; Re:Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Reason:Name of party served does not match the summons and complaint- needs correction on #3.a.; #3.b. (Person served on behalf of entity) should be completed with Person authorized to accept listed; #5.b.(4) must be completed if substituted service; #6 needs correction.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: To:Gabriel Godinez; Re:Proof of Service of Summons/Complaint; Reason:Name of party served does not match the summons and complaint- needs correction on #3.a.; #5.b.(4) and (5) must be completed if substituted service; #6 needs correction.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice - Comment: in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: of Gabriel A. Godinez in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application / Petition - Comment: for Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue; Memorandum of Point and Authorities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 05/20/2019; Served: 05/20/2019; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 09/03/2019 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREG FENTON, KERN COUNTY BUILDING OFFICIAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JENKINS, PHILLIP T.