Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 07/11/2021 at 07:36:35 (UTC).

LIEBENGOOD VS LANATHOUA

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 LIEBENGOOD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LANATHOUA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0633

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIEBENGOOD, DAVID L

Defendant

LANATHOUA, PIERRE J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDMONSTON, CRAIG A

Defendant Attorney

GIBBS, PATRICK J

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/07/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15am Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Barmann, Bernard C., Jr.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Assignment to Judge for All Purposes - Comment: Judge Barmann Dept. 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to Pierre J. Lanathoua via personal service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/20/20219:57 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 07/07/2021 Hearing Time: 9:15am Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDMONSTON, CRAIG A