Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:16:03 (UTC).

LEYVA ET AL VS ARNOLD

Case Summary

On 07/09/2015 LEYVA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARNOLD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1326

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEYVA, DIANA

LEYVA, JOSE

Defendants

ARNOLD, WAYNE

PARK PLACE SPECIAL EVENTS

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

9/9/15 Minute Order - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: LEYVA, JOSE; Plaintiff: LEYVA, DIANA; Defendant: ARNOLD, WAYNE

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Contested (CS); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: ARNOLD, WAYNE; Awarded Against: LEYVA, JOSE; LEYVA, DIANA; Party: Names: LEYVA, JOSE; LEYVA, DIANA; ARNOLD, WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - 9/9/15 Minute Order - Small Claims Trial: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Judgment; Parties Present Plaintiff: LEYVA, JOSE; Plaintiff: LEYVA, DIANA; Defendant: ARNOLD, WAYNE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: PERSONAL SRV TO WAYNE ARNOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LEYVA, JOSE, LEYVA, DIANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: VIA L BIN

    Read MoreRead Less