This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 12:00:52 (UTC).

LEWELLEN VS LEWELLEN

Case Summary

On 08/09/2017 LEWELLEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LEWELLEN. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Pritchard, Kenneth G. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0259

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEWELLEN, DANIEL

Respondent

LEWELLEN, TERA

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 03/20/2019: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing

Ex Parte Hearing 02/15/2019: Hearing Time: 1:15 PM; Result: Held

Motion - DCSS (Modification)

Motion - DCSS (Modification) 07/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

Motion (DCSS)

Motion (DCSS) 05/15/2018: Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: LEWELLEN, DANIEL; Respondent: LEWELLEN, TERA

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

DCSS-Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Hearing on Waiver of Fees

Hearing on Waiver of Fees 08/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: LEWELLEN, DANIEL

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketResponsive Declaration - Comment: TO REQUEST FOR ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Ex Parte Hearing 02/15/2019: Request for Order - Petitioner 03/20/2019: Request for Order - Petitioner 04/17/2019: Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketOrder on Request to Continue Hearing (FL-307) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 03/20/2019: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Multiple Motions-Various Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketSummons & Supplemental Complaint (DCSS) - Comment: Supplemental Summons and Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Denied / Payment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Comment: Arrangement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing on Waiver of Fees - Hearing on Waiver of Fees 08/23/2017: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Hearing Ordered - Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less