This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:43:59 (UTC).

LEON VS MASON

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 LEON filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MASON. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1689

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEON, AGUILES

Defendants

MASON, JEREMY RAY

PECK, DALLAS COLTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2017
  • DocketMail Returned Undelivered - Comment: Notice of Order to Show Cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: LEON, AGUILES; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 3230 "Q" Street Bakersfield, CA. 93301; The Rental Agreement Is Cancelled; Awarded Against: MASON, JEREMY RAY; PECK, DALLAS COLTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: return L bin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Possession; Affidavit - Comment: of Daily Rental Value Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Clerks Judgment - Comment: Jeremy Ray Mason, Dallas Colton Peck

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Dallas Colton Peck

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Jeremy Ray Mason

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LEON, AGUILES; Served: 04/05/2017; Served: 04/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: Local Rule 3.15.1(c)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketAddress and Zip Code of Unlawfully Detained Property - Comment: 3230 "Q" STREET BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301 KERN COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less