This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 10:06:51 (UTC).

LEON VS CORRECTIONAL OFFICER HADDAD ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/24/2015 LEON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CORRECTIONAL OFFICER HADDAD. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1088

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEON, ANTHONY

Defendants

CORRECTIONAL OFFICER R. TATE

CORRECTIONAL OFFICER SIMPSON

CORRECTIONAL OFFICER HADDAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

LODHOLZ, SEAN W.

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proposed Order Cover Sheet: Need a stand alone PDF version of the proposed order also.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proposed Order: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Paper filings are not accepted.

Ruling

Ruling 03/22/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Result: Ruling

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss 03/13/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Comment: 2/07/2019 Defendant: TAIT Motion for Dismissal ResID: 34129; Parties Present Plaintiff: LEON, ANTHONY; Defendant; Attorney: LODHOLZ, SEAN W.

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Further Case Management Conference 01/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

Ruling

Ruling 01/15/2019: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling; Comment: on Request filed by Plaintiff on 1/7/2019

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Summons does not conform to complaint.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Name all Defendants on 1 single Summons and resubmit. Please do not include Officer badge numbers.

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 10/01/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: Cont'd from 07/16/18

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND SERVE THE CASE THE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order Before Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: On May 9, 2019, this Court issued an order granting defendant's motion to dismiss pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure, sections 583.210 and 583.250, subdivision (a). Notice of entry of the Court's order was filed on May 10, 2019. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in accordance with the Court's May 9, 2019 order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: of Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketOrder Granting Motion - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: IT IS ORDERED as follows: Defendant's motion is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice under California Code of Civil Procedure, section 583.250. Plaintiff has failed to comply With the requirements of section 583.210 of the California Code of Civil Procedure, which establishes mandatory deadlines for serving the summons and complaint and filing proof of service. Plaintiff has offered no basis for tolling these deadlines under section 583.240(d).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: Proposed Order Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Proposed Order Cover Sheet: Need a stand alone PDF version of the proposed order also.

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: CIVIL DIVISION DOES NOT SERVE CIVIL DOCUMENTS; MUST BE DIRECTED TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketNotice of Lien - Comment: on proceeds on judgment/actions/settlement obtained by plaintiff: Anthony Leon Lien Claimant:CourtCall LLc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • DocketFacsimile Transmission Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved; Unserved; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: SUMMONS DOESN'T CONFORM TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/13/16 Hearing Time: 830 AM Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2015
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: FILED BY ANTHONY LEON CMC 3/28/16 @ 830 AM D11

    Read MoreRead Less