This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:27:58 (UTC).

LEMOS VS LEMOS

Case Summary

On 03/15/2017 LEMOS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LEMOS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Mojave Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Green, Kenneth R., Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0093

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mojave Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEMOS, JENNIFER

Respondent

LEMOS, RUBEN

 

Court Documents

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees

Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees 04/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Petitioner: LEMOS, JENNIFER

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing - Granted In Whole - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees - Fee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees 04/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DocketFee Waiver - Hearing on Reconsideration on Waiver of Fees - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • DocketNotice on Hearing About Court Fees - Granted - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketRequest For Hearing About Court Fees (FW-006)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Denied / Ineligible - Judicial Officer: Green, Kenneth R., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less