This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:34:24 (UTC).

LELAND VS LELAND

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 LELAND filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LELAND. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3041

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LELAND, JUSTIN THOMAS

Defendant

LELAND, CHRISTINA MARIE

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: LELAND, JUSTIN THOMAS; Defendant: LELAND, CHRISTINA MARIE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal After Mediation(CS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: AS TO CHRISTINA LELAND BY PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketCertified Mail Unclaimed - Comment: AS TO CHRISTINA MARIE LELAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LELAND, JUSTIN THOMAS; Served: 12/09/201710:45 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: AS TO CHRISTINA MARIE LELAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Requesting Certified Service of Claim - Comment: AS TO CHRISTINA MARIE LELAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "L"

    Read MoreRead Less