This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 00:44:41 (UTC).

LAWRENCE A HERSTEIN, SR. DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/04/2015 LAWRENCE A HERSTEIN, SR DECEASED was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Knight, Alisa R. and Kendall, Andrew. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***********4957

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Knight, Alisa R.

Kendall, Andrew

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HERSTEIN, CHRISTOPHER LAWRENCE

Decedent

HERSTEIN, LAWRENCE A, Sr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HERBERT, MARC K

 

Court Documents

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex Parte Discharge/order; rejected via e-file

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex Parte Discharge/order; rejected via e-file

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER E-FILE

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 05/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HERBERT, MARC K

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Inventory & Appraisal

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Inventory & appraisal

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 03/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME REVISED NOTE - 1. Unable to determine statutory fee until Corrected Final I&A & Supplemental I&A have been filed. NEW NOTE- 2. Original signature for probate referee is missing and total value of attachment #2 should be $140,094 on Corrected Final I&A filed 01/19/18. Need new Corrected Final I&A.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HERBERT, MARC K

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Inventory & Appraisal

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 01/24/2018: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING - SAME REVISED NOTES - 1. Notice to FTB per PC 9202 (c) mailed 09/06/17. Claims by public entity are not barred until period provided for in statute expires. Supplement filed 12/05/17 states a response from FTB is still pending and will forward to Court when received. Need response from FTB. 2. Supplement filed 12/05/17 states once Supplement I&A is provided, a Corrected Final I&A with each item listed separately will be filed. Supplemental I&A filed 12/05/17. Need original Corrected Final I&A. 3. Unable to determine statutory fee until Corrected Final I&A & Supplemental I&A have been filed.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Letter

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Inventory & appraisal returned to attorney via mail

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 09/27/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES - 1. Notice to FTB per PC 9202 (c) mailed 09/06/17. Claims by public entity are not barred until period provided for in statute expires. 2. Petition refers to decedent owning real property, however no real property is listed in the Inventory & Appraisal filed 11/15/16. If real property is an asset of the estate, need a Supplemental I&A, to be appraised by the probate referee. 3. Final I&A filed 11/15/16 does not comply w/PC 8900. Also, each item must be listed separately. Need Corrected Final I&A. 4. Unable to determine statutory fee until Corrected Final I&A & Supplemental I&A have been filed. 5. Need further allegation per PC 9202(b) re an heir or beneficiary having previously been confined. 6. Need itemized ending property on hand schedule, which includes full legal description of real property. 7. Need proof of mailing to supplement filed 09/12/17. 8. Notice mailed to California Victim Compensation Board on 09/06/17; however, in paragraph 7 of petition, states no heir is confined in a prison/facility under the jurisdiction of Department of Corrections, etc. Has this status changed since the filing of petition? Need clarification by way of verified supplement.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HERBERT, MARC K

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice:

Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting

7/5/17 MO: Final Distribution/Waiver of Accountingution/Waiver of Accounting 07/05/2017: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTES - 1. Requesting reimbursement of costs in prayer, however no such request is made in the petition. 2. Petition refers to decedent owning real property, however no real property is listed in the Inventory & Appraisal filed 11/15/16. If real property is an asset of the estate, need a Supplemental I&A, to be appraised by the probate referee. 3. Final I&A filed 11/15/16 does not comply w/PC 8900. Also, each item must be listed separately. Need Corrected Final I&A. 4. Unable to determine statutory fee until Corrected Final I&A & Supplemental I&A have been filed. 5. Need further allegation per PC 9202(b) re an heir or beneficiary having previously been confined. 6. Need allegation re notice to Franchise Tax Board per PC 9202(c). 7. Need itemized ending property on hand schedule, which includes full legal description of real property. 8. The Notice of Hearing does not match the title of the pleading.

Petition for Probate of Will

4/28/16 MO: Petition for probate of will: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HERBERT, MARC K

Petition for Probate of Will

**MO - Probate Public: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE- 1. Petitioner requesting IAEA powers in petition. However, #5 on notice of petition is not marked regarding powers and also not included in proof of publication. Need new notice and proof of publication to include these powers.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HERBERT, MARC K

Petition for Probate of Will

Petition fo probate of will 091015: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE- 1. Need proof of publication. 2. #1 on petition filed 07/27/15 indicates publication will be in the Antelope Valley Press, the adjudicated newspaper for Rosamond is the Rosamond Weekly News. 3. Petitioner's name in #2 does not match signature (full name vs. initial). How does petitioner request to be appointed? Need clarification by way of verified supplement. 4. Petitioner's name on petition does not match name listed on notice of petition. Need amended notice of petition. 5. #3 d indicates "Special administrator is the name executor," however, petition is for Probate of Will and for Letter. Need clarification by way of verified supplement. 6. 5 a (2)(b) indicates spouse is deceased which is inconsistent with supporting documents. Need clarification by way of verified supplement.; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: HERBERT, MARC K

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Petition for Final Discharge & Order-Estate - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex Parte Discharge/order; rejected via e-file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Rejection Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: Ex Parte Discharge/order; rejected via e-file

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketReceipt - Comment: Receipt from Distributee for Property Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketReceipt - Comment: Receipt from Distributee for Property Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Comment: Order for Distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: ORDER E-FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Distribution/Waiver of Accounting - Final Distribution/Waiver of Accounting 05/02/2018: Judicial Officer: Kendall, Andrew; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: READY FOR HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketSupplement - Comment: Third verified supplement to petition for final distirbution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DocketInventory and Appraisal - Comment: Corrected Final

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will - Petition fo probate of will 091015: Judicial Officer: Knight, Alisa R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: NOT READY FOR HEARING NOTE- 1. Need proof of publication. 2. #1 on petition filed 07/27/15 indicates publication will be in the Antelope Valley Press, the adjudicated newspaper for Rosamond is the Rosamond Weekly News. 3. Petitioner's name in #2 does not match signature (full name vs. initial). How does petitioner request to be appointed? Need clarification by way of verified supplement. 4. Petitioner's name on petition does not match name listed on notice of petition. Need amended notice of petition. 5. #3 d indicates "Special administrator is the name executor," however, petition is for Probate of Will and for Letter. Need clarification by way of verified supplement. 6. 5 a (2)(b) indicates spouse is deceased which is inconsistent with supporting documents. Need clarification by way of verified supplement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2015
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketLast Will & Testament Received/Lodged - Comment: BRW-15-001019 6/10/13 Seven (7) pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DocketPetition for Probate - Comment: Petition for Probate of Will and for Letters of Administration with Will Annexed Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act with Full Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Petition for Probate...returned via mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • Docket874W PMT: Probate New Suit - 1st Petition <$250,000 GC - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for HERSTEIN, CHRISTOPHER LAWRENCE (PE-1). Received from MARC K HERBERT, check no(s) 5677. Receipt #837859 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketNew Case Filed - Comment: Post Conversion Addition for Reporting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: PETITION FOR PROBATE RETURNED VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.