This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/28/2020 at 10:07:45 (UTC).

LARA VS LEDESMA

Case Summary

On 03/01/2013 LARA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LEDESMA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Delano / Mcfarland Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Tafoya, Robert S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2477

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Tafoya, Robert S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LARA, ALEXIS D

Respondent

LEDESMA, BENJAMIN N

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketNP1045A - Comment: Department: AD Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: RESPONDENT'S REQUEST FOR ORDER IN RE: CHILD SUPPORT AND VISITATION THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: ALEXIS D LARA (PE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. BENJAMIN N LEDESMA (RE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. PETITIONER DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. RESPONDENT DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. THE COURT FINDS AS FOLLOWS: PARTIES HAVE REACHED AN AGREEMENT AS TO CUSTODY AND VISITATION MEDIATION AGREEMENT ON FILE HEREIN MADE AN ORDER OF THE COURT. BENJAMIN N. LEDESMA (RE-1) TO PAY THE SUM OF $608.00 PER MONTH FOR THE SUPPORT OF MINOR CHILD(REN). CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS SHALL COMMENCE 3/5/2014. AND ARE PAYABLE ON THE 5TH OF EACH MONTH THE COURT'S FINDINGS AND ORDERS ON SUPPORT ARE AS INDICATED IN THE DISSOMASTER ATTACHED HERETO AND INCORPORATED HEREIN BY REFERENCE. ALEXIS D. LARA (PE-1) TO PREPARE ORDER AFTER HEARING. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketRequest for Order (Pet) - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: Re: Modification on Child Support & Child Visitation Personal Service on: 01/27/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Original Type: Request for Order - Petitioner; Judicial Officer: Tafoya, Robert S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: Re: Modification on Child Support & Child Visitation Personal Service on: 01/27/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketMediation Agreement - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Docket4999 Mediation Appointment - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: ****DELANO MEDIATION***ENGLISH SPEAKING****COURT DATE: 02/21/14 1 MINOR: RYLIE(6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketMediation Appointment - Original Type: Mediation Appointment; Judicial Officer: Mediator, FCS; Hearing Time: 01:45 PM; Result: CONV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2014
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2013
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: DEFAULT JUDGMENT - Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • DocketUCCJEA - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • DocketIncome and Expense Declaration - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2013
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 694

    Read MoreRead Less