This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:47:23 (UTC).

LANSER ET AL VS LONGCRIER ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 LANSER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LONGCRIER. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2389

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROWN, CHANELL

JOHNSON, DANOLA

LANSER, TRACY

Defendants

BAKERSFIELD HOMELESS CENTER

HERNANDEZ, NAYELI

ZAMORA, FRANCISCO

GAMINO, YVONNE

BETHANY SERVICES DBA BAKERSFIELD HOMELESS CENTER

LONGCRIER, ASHLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FINE, MICKEY L

VAZIRI, SIAMAK

Defendant Attorney

PARKS, MARSHAL R.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: PARKS, MARSHAL R.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: Declaration and Order Missing fee

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Case Management Conference 05/29/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 04/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Defendant; Attorney: PARKS, MARSHAL R.

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110

Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: as to defendant settling Ashly Longcrier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: NO PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO BAKERSFIELD HOMELESS CENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without Prejudice on Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With Prejudice as to Defendants Nayeli Hernandez and Francisco Zamora only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO BAKERSFIED HOMELESS CENTER. SUBSTITUTED SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO YVONNE GAMINO. PERSONAL SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Conference 06/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketNotice - Comment: of association of counsel Siamak Vaziri

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint - Comment: Answer to complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 01/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA AMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/25/2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 01/30/2018; Served: 07/07/2018; Served: 03/28/2018; Served: 03/28/2018; Served: 01/29/2018; Served: 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less