This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/20/2022 at 22:14:19 (UTC).

LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC VS JONES

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JONES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1567

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC

Defendant

JONES, CHRIS

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 11/19/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)sc-133 mailed to defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment Uncontested (CS); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC; Awarded Against: JONES, CHRIS; Amount; Damages: $5,000.00; Costs: $175.00; Total: $5175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 11/19/2021: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (SC-104) - Comment: PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC; Served: 10/19/20212:10 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: Anthony Meeks

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAMAR CENTRAL OUTDOOR, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant