Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:00:40 (UTC).

LALA VS CANAS, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2015 LALA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CANAS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0057

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LALA, MUBEAN

Defendants

BAKER, LADERAS

CANAS, ANDREA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2015
  • Cause of Action: Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; Type: Action; Filed By: 10521; Filed Against: 1052110521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment - Clerk Default Judgment Before Trial (CL/CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: LALA, MUBEAN; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 521 W. Ward #C Ridgecrest, CA 93555; Awarded Against: CANAS, ANDREA; BAKER, LADERAS; Party: Names: LALA, MUBEAN; CANAS, ANDREA; BAKER, LADERAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • Rejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2015
  • Cause Of Action - Action Unlawful Detainer Final Money Judgment; File Date: 09/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • Writ of Possession Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Writ of Possession Issued - Comment: Kern County

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution Possession or - Comment: Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Judgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service - Comment: CNL Legal Doc Prep

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Andrea Canas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: Laderas Baker

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: LALA, MUBEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Complaint - Unlawful Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • Affidavit - Paralegal / Typing Service

    Read MoreRead Less