This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 11/30/2022 at 08:26:58 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC VS ALVAREZ

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ALVAREZ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1495

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

Defendant

ALVAREZ, ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIKA BRANDON J

 

Court Documents

Complaint

06/16/2022: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

06/23/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

06/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Order to Show Cause

06/24/2022: Order to Show Cause

Notice of Lis Pendens

07/15/2022: Notice of Lis Pendens

Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

07/25/2022: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint

Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

08/30/2022: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

Request for Dismissal (Partial)

10/03/2022: Request for Dismissal (Partial)

Request for Court Judgment

10/03/2022: Request for Court Judgment

Declaration

10/03/2022: Declaration

Declaration

10/03/2022: Declaration

Proof of Service by Mail

10/03/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Judgment by Default by Court

11/03/2022: Judgment by Default by Court

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Dept.: Bakersfield Division L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Judgment by Default by Court; Comment: Against Robert Alvarez; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Comment: Proof of Service by Mail; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Brandon J. Mika in Support of Application for Default Judgment; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Declaration; Comment: Declaration of Plaintiff in Support of Application for Default Judgment 585d; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Court Judgment; Comment: As to Robert Alvarez on complaint filed 6/16/22; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Dismissal (Partial); Comment: Without prejudice as to Does 1-100; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered; Comment: As to Robert Alvarez on complaint filed 6/16/22; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint; Comment: as to Robert Alvarez, via subservice; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Lis Pendens; Comment: Notice of Pendency of Action; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 10/06/2022Hearing Time: 8:30 AMHearing Department/Division: L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIKA BRANDON J