This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 07:29:47 (UTC).

L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION VS RUBIO

Case Summary

On 08/13/2015 L A COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RUBIO. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Taft / Maricopa Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillips, Craig G.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0064

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Taft / Maricopa Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Phillips, Craig G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP

L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION

Defendants

RUBIO, BASILISA

RUBIO, BASILISA Z

adba LOS PRIMOS CARNISERIA

LOS PRIMOS CARNICERIA

ZUNIGA, BASILISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEMOINE, JESSICA L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed; Comment: Re: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Phillips, Craig G.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV); Party: Names: L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION; RUBIO, BASILISA Z

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Without Prejudice as to Entire Action of All Parties and All Causes of Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: By Substituted Service as to Basilisa Z. Rubio..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • DocketDeclaration of Due Diligence Filed - Comment: Attempted to Serve Basilisa Z. Rubio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: Attempted to Serve Basilisa Z. Rubio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2015
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: Attempted to Serve Basilisa Z. Rubio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 09/25/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less