This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 22:52:33 (UTC).

L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION, DBA CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP VS DAVID RICHARD CAPELLI JR. AKA DAVID CAPELLI, INDIVIDUALLY, DBA CAPELLI DRYWALL

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 L A COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC , A CORPORATION, DBA CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAVID RICHARD CAPELLI JR AKA DAVID CAPELLI, INDIVIDUALLY, DBA CAPELLI DRYWALL. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1517

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L.A. COMMERCIAL GROUP, INC., A CORPORATION, DBA CONTINENTAL COMMERCIAL GROUP

Defendant

DAVID RICHARD CAPELLI JR. AKA DAVID CAPELLI, INDIVIDUALLY, DBA CAPELLI DRYWALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEMOINE, JESSICA L

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(f) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.740(d) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA S.A.S.E.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(f)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.740(d)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.