This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 05:06:42 (UTC).

L & M LUMBER, INC., A CORPORATION VS MAHONEY, ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/14/2015 L M LUMBER, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MAHONEY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Glennon, Donald P., Jr., Stainfield, Bryan K., Pritchard, Kenneth G., Woodward, Cory J. and Webster, Jason W.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0073

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Glennon, Donald P., Jr.

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

Woodward, Cory J.

Webster, Jason W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

L & M LUMBER, INC., A CORPORATION

Defendants

MAHONEY, JOHN J

JOHN J. MAHONEY, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAITH, SCOTT C

 

Court Documents

Further Case Management Conference

**MO - Continuance: Judicial Officer(s): Stainfield, Bryan K., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Further Case Management Conference

4/29/16 Further Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer(s): Stainfield, Bryan K., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HAITH, SCOTT C

Case Management Conference

4/15/16 CONT CMC: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

Ruling

Ruling BKS 4/12/16: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Further Case Management Conference

3/18/16 MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Judicial Officer(s): Woodward, Cory J., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

Ruling

Ruling DPG: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Case Management Conference

MO - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer(s): Pritchard, Kenneth G., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HAITH, SCOTT C

Case Management Conference

MO - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: HAITH, SCOTT C

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2016
  • DocketAbstract Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Glennon, Donald P., Jr.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: L & M LUMBER, INC., A CORPORATION; Awarded Against: MAHONEY, JOHN J; JOHN J. MAHONEY, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN; Amount; Damages: $12,613.29; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,261.32; Attorney Fees: $2,141.99; Costs: $1,342.82; Total: $17359.42; Party: Names: L & M LUMBER, INC., A CORPORATION; MAHONEY, JOHN J; JOHN J. MAHONEY, A BUSINESS ENTITY, FORM UNKNOWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Stainfield, Bryan K.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • DocketDeclaration in Lieu of Testimony Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • DocketRequest For Entry of Default Not Entered - Comment: For the Following Reason(s): Previously Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - **MO - Continuance: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFurther Case Management Conference - 4/29/16 Further Case Management Conference: Judicial Officer(s): Stainfield, Bryan K., Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - MO - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - MO - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Judicial Officer: Webster, Jason W.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Continued - Court's Motion Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: Does 1-20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: John J. Maoney Constructin, A Business Entity, form unknown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: John J. Mahoney, an individual

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.