This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 07:51:25 (UTC).

KUMMER VS LAXMI US 1234 FOOD CORP.

Case Summary

On 09/10/2014 KUMMER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LAXMI US 1234 FOOD CORP. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brumfield, Lorna H. and Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7402

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KUMMER, DIXON G

Bakersfield, CA 93301

Defendants

LAXMI US 1234 FOOD CORP.

AULAKH, NARINDER

UPPLE, SHINDA

AULAKH, GURSEWAK SINGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KUMMER, DIXON G

1200 Truxtun Ave #140

Bakersfield, CA 93301

Defendant Attorneys

GRASS, ROGER R

LAHIRI, INDRA

 

Court Documents

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Mandatory Settlement Conference

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing MSC: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: JT/FCMC 6/13/16, T/E 2-3 DAYS, D-12; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMMER, DIXON G; Defendant; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R; Defendant; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R; Defendant: UPPLE, SHINDA; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R; Defendant: AULAKH, GURSEWAK SINGH

Case Management Conference

Minute Order-CMC 8/26/15: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMMER, DIXON G; Defendant; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R; Defendant; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R; Defendant; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R

Motion to Set Aside (Post-Disposition)

MO-MOTION TO SET ASIDE: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/5/15 Defendants, Laxmi US 1234 Food Corp, Gursewak Singh Aulakh, Narinder Aulakh, Shinda Upple Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment and Request for Order Vacating and Setting Aside Default; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KUMMER, DIXON G; Defendant; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R; Defendant; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R; Defendant; Attorney: GRASS, ROGER R; Defendant: AULAKH, GURSEWAK SINGH

Ruling

Ruling: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - **MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: crc 3.1385

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Clerical Error; Comment: RE: SANCTIONS/DEFAULT IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 AS TO DEFENDANT NARINDER AULAKH FOR FAILING TO APPEAR AT MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING ON 05/13/2016. ****AS WHY COMMISSIONER SHOULD NOT STRIKE HER ANSWER****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: JURY TRIAL 6/13/16; T/E 2-3 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: T/E 2-3 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Pre-Disposition) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other; Comment: RE:SANCTIONS/DEFAULT AS TO DEFENDANT NARINDER AULAKH FOR FAILING TO APPEAR AT MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE HEARING ON 05/13/2016 AND WHY COMMISSIONER SHOULD NOT STRIKE ANSWER AS TO NARINDER AULAKH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - **MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Unconditional

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorneys - Comment: Former Attorney: Roger Grass, Esq New Attorney: Indra Lahiri

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO NARINDER AULAKH PERSONAL SERVICE 9/16/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO LAXMI US 1234 FOOD CORP. PERSONAL SERVICE 9/16/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO GURSEWAK SINGH AULAKH SUB SERVED 9/16/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • Docket844L Pmt: Ltd Civil Complaint > $10,000 GC 70613(A) - Comment: Amount of $370.00 for KUMMER, DIXON G (PL-1). Received from DIXON G KUMMER, check no(s) 1602. Receipt #798725 for amount of $370.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SOUTH VALLEY ATTY SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: OSC 105

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Dec 24, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Dec 24, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_12 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Comment: FILED BY DIXON G. KUMMER CMC HRG 3/11/15 8:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.