This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 17:26:44 (UTC).

KORIN VS FARROW HOMES

Case Summary

On 03/14/2014 KORIN filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against FARROW HOMES. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brumfield, Lorna H., Clark, Thomas S. and Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1518

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABDULLAH KORIN

BANKS, JOE

BANKS, JUANITA

CABITLA, MARCELO

CABITLA, VICKI

CERDA, MARTIN

CLARK, LUKE

TRAVIS, CELESTE

DHAND, DARSHAN S.

DIXON, KEISHA

GARCIA, ZESIA

GONZALEZ, SERGIO

GORHAM, PERRY

GREWAL, KIRNPAL

GREWAL, GURMEET

GREWAL, JASTINDER

HALLUM, MILLARD

HALLUM, DORIS

HERNANDEZ, RICHARD

HERRERA, CONRADO

71 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BELTON, JEFFREY T

Attorney at LAW OFC DANIL MONTELEONE

8132 Tunney Ave

Reseda, CA 91335

Other Attorneys

BLACK, JOHN E

MAYO, BRIGITTE M

RODMAN, JORDAN A

PARKER, JAMES C

NIEMANN, ANNA JEANNE

SOUZA, JAMES P

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

HALL, DAVID M

HENDERSON, BETH

FIDGER, ANGELA R

BELILOVE, STEVE R

YOUNG, DAVID E

EBNER, DARREN M

LASKIN, TAMARA A

MORROW, WILLIAM D

LETOFSKY, LARRY D

DOVE, MARK S

REID, STEWART D

MCCLAIN, ROBYN S

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal

Order to Show Cause in re: Dismissal 09/21/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: As to Complaint only

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 06/26/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held; Comment: pending meeting with special master

Ruling

Minute Order Dated 6-12-18: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Minute Order 6/7/2018: Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: Ruling

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY STATES "A TRUE COPY OF THE ORDER IS ATTACHED HERETO AS EXHIBIT A". EXHIBIT A IS MISSING. RETURNED VIA USPS

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 04/04/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: TO BE HEARD IN DEPT. 17 JURY ROOM WITH SPECIAL MASTER MR. FRIEDENBERG; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T; Plaintiff; Attorney: BELTON, JEFFREY T

Further Case Management Conference

Further Case Management Conference 01/18/2018: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: STIPULATION TO DISMISS FARROW HOMES CROSS-COMPLAINT AGAINST TRI-K, WITHOUT PREJUDICE; MISSING FEE OF $20

Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement

Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement 07/28/2017: Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 6/30/17 Cross-Defendant / Cross-Complainant, ACCURATE TRENCHING, INC. Motion for Order Determining Good Faith Settlement ResID: 25151

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: RE: Motion - Missing Fees

Rejection/Correction Notice

Rejection/Correction Notice: Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL; ITEM #1.B.3 FILED DATE OF CROSS COMPLAINT IS INCORRECT

Ruling

Ruling 11/03/2016: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Result: Ruling

Further Case Management Conference

cmc mo: Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Result: Held

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: SET PER CMO #10 DATED 11/28/17 as to OASIS AIR CONDITIONING, INC and ACCURATE TRENCHING, INC only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: as to OASIS AIR CONDITIONING, INC and ACCURATE TRENCHING, INC only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: as to OASIS AIR CONDITIONING, INC and ACCURATE TRENCHING, INC only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: AS TO COMPLAINT ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: WHY CROSS-COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 AS TO FARROW HOMES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: with prjudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: With prejudice as to Cross-Complaint filed by Farrow Homes

    Read MoreRead Less
336 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Original Type: Order to Show Cause; Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: 6/27/14 OSC VACATED POS FILED ~ calid=2506918 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4159, CourtDate:06/27/2014, Courtroom:17, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:OSC, Judge:LHB, SystemDate:3/19/2014 10:15:39 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO FARROW HOMES PERSONAL SERVICE 6/18/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: Amount of $1,000.00 for ABDULLAH KORIN (PL-1). Received from DANIL MONTELEONE, check no(s) 1889. Receipt #769238 for amount of $1,435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • Docket800Q Pmt: New Suit - Unlimited Civil GC 70611 (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for ABDULLAH KORIN (PL-1). Received from DANIL MONTELEONE, check no(s) 1889. Receipt #769238 for amount of $1,435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 27, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110 TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL: YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR ON Jun 27, 2014 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT_17 OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT TO GIVE ANY LEGAL REASON WHY SANCTIONS SHALL NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO SERVE THE COMPLAINT ON ALL NAMED DEFENDANTS AND FILE PROOF(S) OF SERVICE WITH THE COURT WITHIN SIXTY (60) DAYS AFTER THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT, RULE 3.110. ALL APPEARANCES ARE MANDATORY, UNLESS FIVE (5) COURT DAYS PRIOR TO HEARING DATE THE COURT HAS RECEIVED THE REQUIRED PROOF(S) OF SERVICE, THEN NO APPEARANCE IS NECESSARY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Fast Track - Comment: FILED BY JEFFREY T. BELTON CMC 9/10/14 815AM DEPT 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010) - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Plaintiff, V.

FARROW HOMES, a California Corporation; and DOES 1-300, inclusive,

Detendant.

This Stipulation is entered into by and between Defendant/Cross-Complainant, Farrow Homes

and Cross-Defendant, Tri-K Truss Co. (hereinafter "TRI-K").

RECITALS

WHEREAS, Farrow Homes filed a Cross-Complaint in the above-entitled matter as against Cross-Defendant TRI-K; and

WHEREAS, the parties hereto agrec that the work product of TRI-K is not currently implicated in this litigation;

STIPULATION

1. ITISHEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties hergto, by thetr respective counsel and/or authorized agent, that in exchange for Farrow Homes dismissing its Cross-Complaint without prejudice as against TRI-K, Farrow Homes can later amend its (ross- Complaint to re-name TRI-K and/or Farrow Homes can file a new Complaint and/or Cross-Complaint naming and adding TRI-K if any claims arisc pertaining to the work of TRI-K on the subject properties at issue in the above-captioned matter.

2. For purposes of any statutes of limitations, statutes or repose, or timeliness defgnses, the date of filing any such amendment, new Complaint, and/or new Cross-Complaint on TRI-K shall relate back to the date of the filing of the Original Cross-Complaint as set forth above;

3. Farrow Homes expressly reserves its right to re-tender to any and all insurance carriers of TRI-K and have cach of those tenders relate back to the date of original tender should any dlaims arise pertaining to the work of TRI-K on the subject properties at issue in the above-captioned matter;

4. It is further agreed that should facts arise which would require Farrow Homes to

reassert any claims against TRI-K, the law firm of Skebba, Isaac, Bishop & Henderson will gccept L.EGAL:10553-0020/7847327.1 .

reassert any claims against TRI-K, the law firm of Skebba, Isaac, Bishop & Henderson will gccept L.EGAL:10553-0020/7847327.1 . WOOD, SMITH, HENNING & BERMAN LLP Atiormeys at Law

WOOD, SMITH, HENNING & BERMAN LLP Atiormeys at Law

1401 WILLOW PASS ROAD, SUITE 700 CONCORD, CALIFORNIA 94520- 7982 TRLEPHONE 925 222 3400 ยข Fax 925 356 8250

service on behalf of TRI-K by first-class mail at Skebba, Isaac, Bishop & Henderson's mailing addregs

and file an Answer with the Kern County Superior Court of the State of Nevada within thirty (3Q)

days of service, unless otherwise agreed between the parties.

3. The parties hereto will bear their own fees and costs of litigation up to and including tp

the date of the filing of the dismissal without prejudice of TRI-K.

6. This Stipulation may be executed in counterparts and facsimile signatures shall b

deemed originals.

[T IS SO STIPULATED

DATED: September j__? 2017

7 A DATED: Septembcr._{_"[_, 2017

IT IS SO ORDERED: DATED: . 2017

LEGAL 10553-002077847327 !

WOOD ITH, HENN .\ & BERMAN LLP

Byr ,141/ L

STEWART D. REIRY ANDREW J. MALYON LAUREN E. VANGA Attorneys for Defendant, SHEA LA QUINTA, LLC

SKEBBA, A/ /' i /.

l/({}BISHOP & HENDERSON

JUDGE OF THE SUPERIOR COURT

THOMAS S. CLARK