This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 07:38:34 (UTC).

KOKHANOVSKI VS TD BANK USA, N.A. ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2022 KOKHANOVSKI filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TD BANK USA, N A. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2761

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KOKHANOVSKI, ELENA

Defendants

PATENAUDE & FELIX A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

TD BANK USA, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBENZADEH JUDITH K.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/18/2022: Complaint

Summons Issued and Filed

10/26/2022: Summons Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

10/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

10/26/2022: Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

Order to Show Cause

10/24/2022: Order to Show Cause

Notice of Removal of Action

12/21/2022: Notice of Removal of Action

Notice

12/21/2022: Notice

Ruling

12/23/2022: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling; Result: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice; Comment: Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court; Filed By: DEFENDANT - TD BANK USA, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Notice of Removal of Action; Comment: Notice of Removal of Action to United States District Court; Filed By: DEFENDANT - TD BANK USA, N.A.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Initial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted; Comment: AS TO PLAINTIFF, ELENA KOKHANOVSKI. RETURNED VIAS USPS.; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - KOKHANOVSKI, ELENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Summons Issued and Filed; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - KOKHANOVSKI, ELENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Order to Show Cause; Comment: Re: 3.110Hearing Date: 02/06/2023Hearing Time: 8:30AMHearing Department/Division: 17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketFile Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - KOKHANOVSKI, ELENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010); Filed By: PLAINTIFF - KOKHANOVSKI, ELENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFile Type: Complaint; Filed By: PLAINTIFF - KOKHANOVSKI, ELENA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less