This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:31:36 (UTC).

KNIGHT VS KNIGHT (D)

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 KNIGHT filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KNIGHT D. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Cannon, Gloria and Benavides, Jose R.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4170

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Cannon, Gloria

Benavides, Jose R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KNIGHT, DENNIS

Respondent

KNIGHT, SUSAN

 

Court Documents

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Trial 10/10/18

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 05/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/19/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketMediated Agreement - Settlement of Issues

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Mandatory Settlement Conference 09/13/2018: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Trial 10/10/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketSettlement Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change Name/Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketNotice of Trial - Comment: HRG 10/10/18 DIV D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFamily Centered Case Resolution - Family Centered Case Resolution 05/07/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 3/19/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 5/07/18 DIV D

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketResponse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketInitial Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less