Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/29/2020 at 15:08:52 (UTC).

KNIGHT VS EGGUM ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/18/2014 KNIGHT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EGGUM. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Ridgecrest Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pritchard, Kenneth G.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2635

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ridgecrest Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pritchard, Kenneth G.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KNIGHT, SANDRA

Defendants

EGGUM, MARK

EGGUM, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOSTER, STEVEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2014
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: Document Image

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • DocketNP1511 - Comment: Department: AR Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED 2/18/14 THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES AND COUNSEL PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: SANDRA KNIGHT (PL-1) APPEARS BY STEVEN BOSTER. NO APPEARANCE BY DEFENDANTS. SANDRA KNIGHT (PL-1) MOTION FOR DISMISSING THE MONETARY PORTION OF THE CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE IS GRANTED. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. HEARING BEFORE TRIAL. THE COURT ORDERS ADJOURNMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c) - Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Local Rule 3.15.1(c); Judicial Officer: Pritchard, Kenneth G.; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • Docket4191 Order to Show Cause (Local Rule 3.15.1(c)) - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED TO: Plaintiff herein and Plaintiff's attorney of record, if any: You, and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on 8/22/2014 at 10:00 AM in Department BR, 132 EAST COSO ST, RIDGECREST, CA 93555, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed, or other sanctions imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ [~PERSON:CALJUDGENAME] Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED TO: Plaintiff herein and Plaintiff's attorney of record, if any: You, and each of you, are ordered to appear before the court on 8/22/2014 at 10:00 AM in Department BR, 132 EAST COSO ST, RIDGECREST, CA 93555, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed, or other sanctions imposed for your failure to comply with the Special Rules for Administration of Civil Litigation and more specifically: WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ DONALD P GLENNON JR Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for KNIGHT, SANDRA (PL-1). Received from KNIGHT, SANDRA, check no(s) 2257. Receipt #767190 for amount of $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued - Comment: KERN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • DocketJudgment (Clerk's Default/Restitution Only) Filed & Entered - Comment: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default by Clerk Entered - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: JAMES EGGUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2014
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: MARK EGGUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2014
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: POS, DEFAULT JUDGMENT, WRIT- $25.00 FILING FEE, POS CANNOT HAVE MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS LISTED. SEPARATE PROOF OF SERVICE IS REQUIRED FOR EACH PARTY SERVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketNotice of Commencement of Unlawful Detainer Action - Comment: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215. Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION An Unlawful Detainer Complaint (eviction action) has been filed naming you as a defendant. ACCESS TO THE COURT FILE WILL BE DELAYED FOR 60 DAYS EXCEPT TO A PARTY, AN ATTORNEY FOR ONE OF THE PARTIES, OR ANY PERSON WHO; (1) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAMES OF AT LEAST ONE PLAINTIFF AND ONE DEFENDANT IN THE ACTION AND PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE ADDRESS, INCLUDING ANY APPLICABLE APARTMENT, UNIT OR SPACE NUMBER, OF THE SUBJECT PREMISES OR, (2) PROVIDES TO THE CLERK THE NAME OF ONE OF THE PARTIES IN THE ACTION OR THE CASE NUMBER AND CAN ESTABLISH THROUGH PROPER IDENTIFICATION THAT HE OR SHE LIVES IN THE SUBJECT PREMISES. ACCESS TO THE COURT INDEX, REGISTER OF ACTIONS, OR OTHER RECORDS IS NOT PERMITTED UNTIL 60 DAYS AFTER THE COMPLAINT IS FILED EXCEPT PURSUANT TO AN EXPARTE ORDER UPON SHOWING OF GOOD CAUSE THEREFORE... (SECTION 1161.2 CCP) THE ABOVE RESTRICTIONS DO NOT, HOWEVER, AFFECT OR ALTER YOUR RIGHTS OR RESPONSIBILITIES TO RESPOND TO THIS ACTION WITHIN THE TIMES PRESCRIBED BY LAW. _____________________________________________________________ FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE GREATER BAKERSFIELD LEGAL ASSISTANCE, INC. AT (661) 325-5943 LOCATED AT 615 CALIFORNIA AVENUE, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93304. FOR SELF HELP INFORMATION YOU MAY CONTACT THE KERN COUNTY LAW LIBRARY AND SELF HELP CENTER AT (661) 868-2532 LOCATED AT 1415 TRUXTUN AVENUE, 3RD FLOOR, BAKERSFIELD, CA 93301. OUTSIDE OF BAKERSFIELD YOU MAY CONTACT THE CALIFORNIA RURAL LEGAL ASSISTANCE AT (661) 725-4350 LOCATED AT 601 HIGH STREET, SUITE C, DELANO, CA 93215.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketNotice of Order to Show Cause Re: CRC Rule 3.15.1(c) - Comment: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON May 16, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for dismissal, a judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ DONALD P GLENNON JR Judge of the Superior Court Calendar Notes: NOTICE OF ORDER TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS MATTER SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED RE: LOCAL RULE 3.15.1(c) TO PLAINTIFF AND PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY OF RECORD, IF ANY: YOU AND EACH OF YOU ARE ORDERED TO APPEAR BEFORE THE COURT ON May 16, 2014 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT BR OF THE ABOVE ENTITLED COURT, then and there to show cause, if any you have, why this matter should not be dismissed. All appearances are mandatory, unless five (5) court days prior to hearing date the court has received an amended complaint converting the action to an ordinary civil action, a request for dismissal, a judgment or a notice of settlement, then no appearance is necessary. WARNING! IF YOU FAIL TO APPEAR AS ORDERED HEREIN, THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE (C.C.P. 575.2). Date: ________________________ ____________________________________ DONALD P GLENNON JR Judge of the Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Docket841J Pmt: Unlawful Detainer Fee <$10,000 GC 70613(B); - Comment: Amount of $240.00 for KNIGHT, SANDRA (PL-1). Received from KNIGHT, SANDRA, check no(s) 2244. Receipt #763310 for amount of $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketComplaint - Unlawful Detainer - Comment:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOSTER, STEVEN