This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 21:57:15 (UTC).

KNIGHT VS BOONE ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/08/2015 KNIGHT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BOONE. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Brown, Joanne, Etienne, Linda S. and Lane, Barbara A.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1279

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Brown, Joanne

Etienne, Linda S.

Lane, Barbara A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KNIGHT, ALISA R

Defendants

BOONE, JOHNATHON R.

BAKERSFIELD REALTY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

BOONE, CHRISTINE C.

 

Court Documents

Ruling

Ruling: Judicial Officer: Brown, Joanne; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Small Claims Trial

MO 102315 TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Brown, Joanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: To be heard at 1:30pm; Parties Present Plaintiff: KNIGHT, ALISA R; Defendant: BOONE, JOHNATHON R.; Defendant: BAKERSFIELD REALTY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

Ruling

MO 102315 RULING RE: TRIAL: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2016
  • Acknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: As to all judgment debtors.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2015
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Small Claims Trial - MO 102315 TRIAL: Judicial Officer: Brown, Joanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: To be heard at 1:30pm; Parties Present Plaintiff: KNIGHT, ALISA R; Defendant: BOONE, JOHNATHON R.; Defendant: BAKERSFIELD REALTY MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - MO 102315 RULING RE: TRIAL: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Ruling - Ruling: Judicial Officer: Brown, Joanne; Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • Small Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Brown, Joanne; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Court's Own Motion; Comment: TO BE HEARD AT 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2015
  • Small Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • Ruling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2015
  • Certificate of Mailing - Comment: ALL PARTIES MAILED THE ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2015
  • Order on Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearings - Judicial Officer: Lane, Barbara A.; Comment: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2015
  • Request for Postponement of Small Claims Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2015
  • Ruling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO BAKERSFIELD REALTY MANAGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO JOHNATHAN R BOONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • Proof of Service - Comment: AS TO CHRISTINE C BOONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • Small Claims Trial - Judicial Officer: Lane, Barbara A.; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: OF PLAINTIFF REQUESTING CONTINUANCE TO ALLOW FOR SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less