This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/30/2020 at 22:12:14 (UTC).

KLOHN VS KLOHN (E)

Case Summary

On 03/23/2015 KLOHN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KLOHN E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Shayer, Steven, Stainfield, Bryan K., Loo, Cynthia L., Benavides, Jose R., Fielder, John L., Foley, Therese M., Cannon, Gloria, Gill, Susan M., Robertson, Murray J. and Diesman, Kathleen O.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1926

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Shayer, Steven

Stainfield, Bryan K.

Loo, Cynthia L.

Benavides, Jose R.

Fielder, John L.

Foley, Therese M.

Cannon, Gloria

Gill, Susan M.

Robertson, Murray J.

Diesman, Kathleen O.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KLOHN, VICKI

Respondent

KLOHN, MATTHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A

Attorney at CARLOVSKY LAW OFC APC

5001 California Ave #110

Bakersfield, CA 93309

Respondent Attorneys

GRUEN, RANDY D

LEON, DAVID F

 

Court Documents

Review

Review 10/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Diesman, Kathleen O.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: REVIEW RE: SS CONT'D FROM 6/20/19, 7/17/19, 8/28/19, 9/19/19

Review

Review 09/19/2019: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: REVIEW RE: S/S CONTD FROM 6/20/19 7/17/19 8/28/19

Review

Review 08/28/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: REVIEW RE: S/S CONTD FROM 6/20/19 7/17/19

Review

Review 07/17/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: REVIEW RE: S/S CONTD FROM 6/20/19; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F

Review

Review 06/20/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: RE: S/S

Court Trial

Court Trial 03/21/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Judgment; Comment: 9/12/18 COURT TRIAL; Parties Present Petitioner: KLOHN, VICKI; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: KLOHN, MATTHEW; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 03/14/2019: Judicial Officer: Cannon, Gloria; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 9/12/18 MSC SET BY DIV E TRIAL SET 3/21/19 AT 1:30 PM IN DIV E CONTD FROM 12/20/18; Parties Present Petitioner: KLOHN, VICKI; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: KLOHN, MATTHEW; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 12/20/2018: Judicial Officer: Benavides, Jose R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 09/12/18 MSC SET BY DIV E TRIAL SET 3/21/19 AT 1:30 IN DIV E; Parties Present Petitioner: KLOHN, VICKI; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent: KLOHN, MATTHEW; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 09/12/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: CONT'D FROM 4/10/18 5/22/18 7/11/18; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 07/11/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT'D FROM 04/10/18 5/22/18; Parties Present Respondent; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F

Family Centered Case Resolution

Family Centered Case Resolution 04/10/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: MATTER SET FOR FCCR; Parties Present Respondent: KLOHN, MATTHEW; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F

Mandatory Settlement Conference

Mandatory Settlement Conference 07/06/2017: Judicial Officer: Fielder, John L.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: CONT'D FROM 1/26/17, 4/06/17 AND 5/25/17; Parties Present Petitioner; Attorney: CARLOVSKY, MICHAEL A; Respondent; Attorney: LEON, DAVID F

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Comment: CORRECTED MARITAL STATUS ENDS 09/20/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview - Review 10/30/2019: Judicial Officer: Diesman, Kathleen O.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Dropped; Comment: REVIEW RE: SS CONT'D FROM 6/20/19, 7/17/19, 8/28/19, 9/19/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketJudgment of Dissolution - Judicial Officer: Gill, Susan M.; Comment: MARITAL STATUS ENDS 09/20/19 SIGNED PURSUANT TO C.C.P 635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview - Review 09/19/2019: Judicial Officer: Robertson, Murray J.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: REVIEW RE: S/S CONTD FROM 6/20/19 7/17/19 8/28/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketStipulation for Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview - Review 08/28/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: REVIEW RE: S/S CONTD FROM 6/20/19 7/17/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReview - Review 07/17/2019: Judicial Officer: Foley, Therese M.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: REVIEW RE: S/S CONTD FROM 6/20/19

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2015
  • Docket806U Pmt: First Appearance Family Law GC 70670(D) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for KLOHN, MATTHEW (RE-1). Received from WERNER LAW FIRM, check no(s) 1013. Receipt #837819 for amount of $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order (Pet) - Comment: Hearing Entered. Calendar Notes: PET S/S ATTY F/C PROP RESTRAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order - Petitioner - Original Type: Request for Order - Petitioner; Judicial Officer: Shayer, Steven; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment: PET S/S ATTY F/C PROP RESTRAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2015
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • Docket171E Pmt: Family Law Motion GC 70677(A) EFF 8/6/12 - Comment: Amount of $60.00 for KLOHN, VICKI (PE-1). Received from KLOHN, VICKI, check no(s) 1681, 1684. Receipt #831331 for amount of $495.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2015
  • Docket805L Pmt: New Suit - Family Law GC 70670(B) (8/6/12) - Comment: Amount of $435.00 for KLOHN, VICKI (PE-1). Received from KLOHN, VICKI, check no(s) 1681, 1684. Receipt #831331 for amount of $495.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketRequest for Order with Court Order (FL-300) - Comment: PET HRG DATE: 5/6/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage - Comment: PET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.