This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/27/2020 at 21:45:52 (UTC).

KLEIN VS VENTURA

Case Summary

On 10/24/2012 KLEIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VENTURA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Kern County Metropolitan Division located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5777

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KLEIN, STEPHEN M

STEPHEN M KLEIN DDS PROFESSIONAL CORP

Defendant

VENTURA, RUBY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2014
  • DocketWrit Returned Unsatisfied - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2014
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Full Satisfaction - Comment: DOCUMENT IMAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for KLEIN, STEPHEN M (PL-1). Received from STEPHEN M. KLEIN, DDS, check no(s) 003865. Receipt #747199 for amount of $25.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2013
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: RETURNED VIA PRO PER BIN "K"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • Docket115B Pmt: Writs Issued 70626(A)(1) EFF 7/28/09 - Comment: Amount of $25.00 for KLEIN, STEPHEN M (PL-1). Received from KLIEN, check no(s) 003144. Receipt #711937 for amount of $25.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2013
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Mailed to All Parties - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • DocketNP1500 - Comment: Department: 12 Calendar Notes: NATURE OF PROCEEDINGS: TRIAL BY COURT. DISPOSED AFTER COURT TRIAL, AFTER EVIDENCE BY BOTH SIDES (STATISTICAL PURPOSES ONLY). THE ABOVE ENTITLED CAUSE CAME ON REGULARLY AT THIS TIME TODAY FOR HEARING WITH PARTIES PRESENT AS FOLLOWS: STEPHEN M KLEIN (PL-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. RUBY VENTURA (DE-1) APPEARS IN PROPRIA PERSONA. *************************************************************************************** PLAINTIFF IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT IS DULY SWORN AND TESTIFIES. EVIDENCE PRESENTED BY DEFENSE. THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING FINDINGS AND ORDERS: JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF AGAINST DEFENDANT FOR PRINCIPAL $1,127.71 PLUS COURT COSTS OF $70.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • Docket4150 Small Claims Trial - Comment: Hearing Entered.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2013
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Original Type: Small Claims Trial; Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Deleted in Class Act; Result: CONV; Comment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2013
  • DocketHearing Vacated - Comment: REQUEST FOR POSTPONMENT GRANTED. ~ calid=2076031 Vacating calendar hearing. EventCode:4150, CourtDate:01/10/2013, Courtroom:12, SessionNumber:1, Sequence:0, SessionType:SCT, Judge:LSE, Deputy:lanaes, SystemDate:11/2/2012 11:10:02 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2013
  • DocketOrder on Request to Postpone Small Claims Hearings - Comment: COPY OF ORDER MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 1-7-13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO RUBY VENTURA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2012
  • Docket857A Pmt: Small Claims Postponement Request CCP 116.570(D) - Comment: Amount of $10.00 for VENTURA, RUBY (DE-1). Received from RUBY VENTURA, check no(s) 510. Receipt #692677 for amount of $10.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • DocketRequest for Postponement of Small Claims Hearing - Comment: Document Image

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • Docket853E Pmt: Small Claims Filing Fee (More than $1,500 but not - Comment: Amount of $50.00 for KLEIN, STEPHEN M (PL-1). Received from STEPHEN M KLEIN, check no(s) 003721. Receipt #685052 for amount of $50.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • DocketCONV - Comment: New case created by deputy: 781

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: ENDORSED COPIES PLACED IN PRO PER BIN "K".

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less