This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 05/31/2020 at 07:19:51 (UTC).

KING VS CHRYSTAL CRAIG AKA CHRYSTAL SANDY

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 KING filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against CHRYSTAL CRAIG AKA CHRYSTAL SANDY. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0012

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KING, MICHAEL

Respondent

CHRYSTAL CRAIG AKA CHRYSTAL SANDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SLOCUMB, WILLIAM H, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Petition for Harassment

Petition for Harassment 01/22/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CH-130) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: [AMENDED]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing - Comment: CONFIDENTIAL CLETS INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Entry of Judgment / Order After Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Harassment Restraining Order After Hearing (CH-130) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Harassment - Petition for Harassment 01/22/2020: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service (CH-200)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (CH-109) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: hrg: 1/22/20 @830 am dept 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (CH-110) - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Partly granted and denied 100 yards stay away orders granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: KING, MICHAEL; Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • DocketRequest for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders (CH-100)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.