This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 23:47:25 (UTC).

KILLIAN ET AL VS KAMBOJ ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/30/2017 KILLIAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KAMBOJ. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R. and Chapin, Sidney P.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0713

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Chapin, Sidney P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MISTLER, KIMBERLY

MEIER, SHONDA

KILLIAN, TENA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AMVEE CORPORATION 2, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AMVEE CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WEKAM INC., A CALFORNIA CORPORATION

KAMBOJ, SHASHI

VENUS KAM, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WEKAM INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAUFMAN, MATTHEW A

Defendant Attorney

WEBER, JULIE M

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

DODGIN, DUSTIN S

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference

Case Management Conference 10/02/2017: Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff; Attorney: KAUFMAN, MATTHEW A; Plaintiff; Attorney: KAUFMAN, MATTHEW A; Plaintiff; Attorney: KAUFMAN, MATTHEW A; Defendant; Attorney: WEBER, JULIE M; Defendant; Attorney: WEBER, JULIE M; Defendant; Attorney: WEBER, JULIE M; Defendant; Attorney: WEBER, JULIE M; Defendant; Attorney: WEBER, JULIE M; Cross Complainant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S; Cross Complainant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S; Cross Complainant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S; Cross Complainant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S; Cross Complainant; Attorney: DODGIN, DUSTIN S

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: CROSS-COMPLAINT: FIRST APPEARANCE FEES MUST BE SUBMITTED AT THE TIME OF FILING FOR ALL ANSWERING PARTIES.

Electronic Rejection Notice

Electronic Rejection Notice: Comment: ANSWER: FIRST APPEARANCE FEES MUST BE SUBMITTED AT THE TIME OF FILING FOR ALL ANSWERING PARTIES.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketJury Trial - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: T/E 3 TO 4 DAYS JURY FOR PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketFinal Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: J/T SET 8/20/18 9AM DEPT 11 JURY FOR PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference - Judicial Officer: Chapin, Sidney P.; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: J.T SET 08/20/17 9AM DEPT 11 3-4 DAYS JURY FOR PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal - Comment: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: Entire action is dismissed with prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • DocketAmended Cross-Complaint - Comment: [SECOND] AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT FOR SHASHI KAMBOJ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketMinute Order/Notice of Trial/MSC/Final Case Management Conf

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketNotice of Posting Non-Refundable Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketNotice of Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO SHASHI KAMBOJ, SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO AMVEE CORPORATION ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO AMVEE CORPORATION 2, SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO WEKAM, INC., SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: AS TO VENUS KAM,INC, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 04/23/2017; Served: 04/18/2017; Served: 04/18/2017; Served: 04/18/2017; Served: 04/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 7/19/2017 Hearing Time: 8:30AM Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURN VIA MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less