This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 03/31/2020 at 05:03:10 (UTC).

KIGHT VS KOPPI ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/14/2015 KIGHT filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KOPPI. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0427

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIGHT, DAVID

Defendants

NABORS INDUSTRIES, LTD, AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

KOPPI, TIM

NABORS CORPORATE SERVICES, INC

FOSTER, BRUCE

BYRON, TOMMY

NABORS WELL SERVICES, AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

NABORS COMPLETION AND PRODUCTION SERVICES CO, AN UNKNOWN BUSINESS ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DE CASTRO, DAVID M

 

Court Documents

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

Ruling

Ruling Re Stay: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With Prejudice on Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - **MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceeding

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • DocketRejection/Correction Notice - Comment: Notice of Stay of Proceedings. Rejected in File & Serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - Ruling Re Stay: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: (First Amended) 1. The parties shall arbitrate the claims between Plaintiff and Defendant Nabors Completion & Production Service Co., nka C&J Well Services, Inc. ( Nabors ) only, in connection with plaintiff's employment with Nabors including the claims against Nabors set forth in this Action, before ADR Services, Inc. in Los Angeles County. 2. The matter shall be stayed pending binding arbitration. 3, Within a reasonable time after a final award is granted or settlement is reached, any party shall advise this court of the outcome of the arbitration proceedings, or any settlement. 4. If the matter is not resolved or settled as to all defendants following the plaintiff-Nabors arbitration, plaintiff may pursue this litigation as against the individually named defendants. ***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: 1. The parties shall arbitrate any and all controversies arising out of or in connection with plaintiff's employment with defendant Nabors Completion & Production Service Co., nka C&J Well Services, Inc. ( Nabors ), including the claims set forth in this Action, before ADR Services, Inc. in Los Angeles County. 2. The matter shall be stayed pending binding arbitration. 3. Within a reasonable time after a final award is granted or settlement is reached, any party shall advise this court of the outcome of the arbitration proceedings, or any settlement. 4. If the matter is not resolved or settled as to all defendants following the plaintiff-Nabors arbitration, plaintiff may pursue this litigation as against the individually named defendants. ***JUDGE DAVID R. LAMPE***

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO TIM KOPPI, AN INDIVIDUAL; 1 ATTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO BRUCE FOSTER, AN INDIVIDUAL; 1 ATTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO NABORS INDUSTRIES, LTD., an unknown business entity; 1 ATTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO NABORS WELL SERVICES, an unknown business entity; 1 ATTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service - Comment: AS TO NABORS COMPLETION AND PRODUCTION SERVICES CO.,an unknown business entity; 1 ATTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2015
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: PERSONAL SERVICE ON 8/20/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA ABC LEGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 10/27/2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 A.M. Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.