This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/22/2018 at 06:44:58 (UTC).

KHEHRA VS KHEHRA(E)

Case Summary

On 10/20/2016 KHEHRA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KHEHRA E. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Loo, Cynthia L. and Canaday, Jim R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4595

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch - Justice Building

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Loo, Cynthia L.

Canaday, Jim R

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KHEHRA, VEERPAL KAUR

Respondents

KHEHRA, GURPREET

KHEHRA, GURPREET SINGH

 

Court Documents

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 01/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/29/17 PET STRIKE RESPONSE FROM RESPONDENT AND ALLOW PET TO FILE DEFAULT CONTD FROM 1/16/18 *COMPLIANCE*; Parties Present Petitioner: KHEHRA, VEERPAL KAUR; Respondent: KHEHRA, GURPREET SINGH

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 01/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Canaday, Jim R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 12/29/17 PET STRIKE RESPONSE FROM RESPONDENT AND ALLOW PET TO FILE DEFAULT; Parties Present Petitioner: KHEHRA, VEERPAL KAUR; Respondent: KHEHRA, GURPREET SINGH

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 10/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 09/12/17 PET COMPEL DISCLOSURES; Parties Present Petitioner: KHEHRA, VEERPAL KAUR

Request for Order - Petitioner

Request for Order - Petitioner 12/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 09/12/17 PET COMPEL DISCLOSURES CONTD FROM 10/19/17 *COMPLIANCE*; Parties Present Petitioner: KHEHRA, VEERPAL KAUR

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2018
  • Family Centered Case Resolution - Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: 2/16/18 NOTICE OF HRG FCCR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Notice of Hearing - Comment: HRG 3/26/18 DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • At-Issue Memorandum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • Certified Interpreter Unavailable - Comment: Certification of Unavailability of Certified or Registered Interpreter, filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 01/25/2018: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 12/29/17 PET STRIKE RESPONSE FROM RESPONDENT AND ALLOW PET TO FILE DEFAULT CONTD FROM 1/16/18 *COMPLIANCE*; Parties Present Petitioner: KHEHRA, VEERPAL KAUR; Respondent: KHEHRA, GURPREET SINGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: HRG 1/25/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Appointment of Temporary Judge - Comment: JIM CANADAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Certified Interpreter Unavailable - Comment: Certification of Unavailability of Certified or Registered Interpreter, filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 01/16/2018: Judicial Officer: Canaday, Jim R; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 12/29/17 PET STRIKE RESPONSE FROM RESPONDENT AND ALLOW PET TO FILE DEFAULT; Parties Present Petitioner: KHEHRA, VEERPAL KAUR; Respondent: KHEHRA, GURPREET SINGH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 1/16/18 DIV E

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 12/01/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: 09/12/17 PET COMPEL DISCLOSURES CONTD FROM 10/19/17 *COMPLIANCE*; Parties Present Petitioner: KHEHRA, VEERPAL KAUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Certified Interpreter Unavailable - Comment: Certification of Unavailability of Certified or Registered Interpreter, filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Order - Petitioner - Request for Order - Petitioner 10/17/2017: Judicial Officer: Loo, Cynthia L.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued - Party's Motion Hearing; Comment: 09/12/17 PET COMPEL DISCLOSURES; Parties Present Petitioner: KHEHRA, VEERPAL KAUR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Proof of Personal Service - Comment: HRG 10/17/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2017
  • Request for Order (FL-300) - Comment: HRG 10/17/17 *EMAILED INTREPRETERS*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • Declaration Re Service of Prelim Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • Proof of Service of Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Summons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage

    Read MoreRead Less