This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:33:46 (UTC).

KEYSTONE DBA LKQ CORPORATION VS PREMIER BODYWORKS, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 KEYSTONE DBA LKQ CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PREMIER BODYWORKS, INC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5931

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEYSTONE DBA LKQ CORPORATION

Defendants

VICKI WRIGHT, IND. AND AS GUARANTOR

PREMIER BODYWORKS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHOW, RONNIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketWrit Returned Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued - Comment: Writ of Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • DocketAbstract Issued - Comment: Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs - Comment: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: KEYSTONE DBA LKQ CORPORATION; Awarded Against: PREMIER BODYWORKS, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; VICKI WRIGHT, IND. AND AS GUARANTOR; Amount; Damages: $11,919.24; Pre-Judgment Interest: $1,058.04; Attorney Fees: $2,037.89; Costs: $430.00; Total: $15445.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: AS TO PREMIER BODYWORKS, INC., a California Corporation; and VICKI WRIGHT, individually and as Guarantor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketDeclaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: GRANTING USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Pursuant to CCP 585.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Re: Calculation of Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to PREMIER BODYWORKS, INC., a California Corporation; and VICKI WRIGHT, individually and as Guarantor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO PREMIER BODYWORKS,INC, PERSONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: AS TO VICKI WRIGHT , SUB SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 10/23/2017; Served: 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: January 24, 2018 Hearing Time: 8:30 a.m. Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA US MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less