This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/01/2020 at 05:38:30 (UTC).

KEVIN MACDONALD ET AL VS KMACK CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/25/2016 KEVIN MACDONALD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KMACK CONSTRUCTION, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Lampe, David R., Chapin, Sidney P., Brumfield, Lorna H. and Clark, Thomas S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1715

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judges

Lampe, David R.

Chapin, Sidney P.

Brumfield, Lorna H.

Clark, Thomas S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

MACDONALD, KEVIN S.

KMACK ENTERPRISES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, DBA KMACK CONSTRUCTION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KMACK CONSTRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HASHIM, AARON

HASHIM, PAUL

KMACK CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHINDLER, ERIC J

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

JOYCE, BOB H

SHEFFIELD, ANDREW K

 

Court Documents

Ruling

**MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketAccounting - Comment: Withdrawal in the amount of $266.52 (final interest QE 12/31/2016) to Lebeau Thelen LLP completed on 3/2/2017. sw

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Clark, Thomas S.; Hearing Time: 8:15 AM; Cancel Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry - Comment: of order releasing funds.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketAccounting - Comment: PROCESS TRUST WITHDRAWAL REFUND $180,000 TO LE BEAU THELAN P O BOX 12092 BAKERSFIELD, CA 93389-2092 COMPLETED 11/03/16 CJL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause in re: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed; Comment: WHY CROSS COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1385 COMPLAINT DISMISSED 10/26/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Comment: releasing funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • DocketRuling - Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Brumfield, Lorna H.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketOrder - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Comment: See Ruling Dated 8/15/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling - **MO w/Declaration of Mailing: Hearing Time: 8:00 AM; Result: Ruling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service for Kmack Construction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service for Paul Hashim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • DocketProof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service for Aaron Hashim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 11/07/16 Hearing Time: 08:30 Hearing Department/Division:11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 07/28/2016; Served: 07/28/2016; Served: 07/28/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less