This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 09:40:12 (UTC).

KERN PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY VS NORTHVIEW MEADOWS, LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 KERN PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NORTHVIEW MEADOWS, LLC. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lampe, David R.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2109

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lampe, David R.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KERN PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

NORTHVIEW MEADOWS, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY

NORTHVIEW MEADOWS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCANLON, TIMOTHY G

Defendant Attorney

SLOCUMB, WILLIAM H, Jr.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause

Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/11/21 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 11

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Lampe, David R.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal-Before Trial(CL/CV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Entire) - Comment: With prejudice as to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Insufficient Filing Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: As to Northview Meadows LLC a California Limited Liability Company. Personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: as to DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Personal Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Served: 09/17/2020; Served: 09/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Notice of Assignment and OSC re CRC 3110 and CMC (N18C): Comment: Re: CRC 3.110 Hearing Date: 1/11/21 Hearing Time: 8:30 Hearing Department/Division: 11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KERN PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where DEVELOPERS SURETY AND INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SLOCUMB, WILLIAM H, Jr.