Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 02/17/2018 at 19:20:03 (UTC).

KERN FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS DAVIS

Case Summary

On 07/10/2015 KERN FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DAVIS. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1055

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KERN FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

DAVIS, MELVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOARES, JOSEPH F

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Judgment - Default by Court Before Trial (CL/CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: KERN FEDERAL CREDIT UNION; Awarded Against: DAVIS, MELVIN; Amount; Damages: $23,931.49; Pre-Judgment Interest: $842.03; Attorney Fees: $3,393.14; Costs: $405.00; Total: $28571.66; Party: Names: KERN FEDERAL CREDIT UNION; DAVIS, MELVIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • Abstract Issued - Comment: as to Melvin Davis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • Case Management Conference - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Judgment by Default by Court - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to MELVIN DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • Declaration and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: Accepting copies in lieu of Original contract; signed by Linda S Etienne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - CRC 3.110 - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Proof Of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Declaration - Comment: for Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Comment: as to Melvin Davis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2015
  • Request for Dismissal (Partial) - Comment: as to Does 1-5, Inclusive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2015
  • Proof of Service - Summons / Complaint - Comment: personal, as to Melvin Davis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Civil and Small Claims Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Summons Issued and Filed - Comment: RETURNED VIA PREPAID ENVELOPE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Order to Show Cause - Comment: Re: 3.110 Hearing Date: 10-28-2015 Hearing Time: 8:30 AM Hearing Department/Division: 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet (CM-010)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Complaint - Comment: FILED BY JOSEPH F. SOARES CMC 1-11-2016 8:30 AM D12

    Read MoreRead Less