This case was last updated from Kern County Superior Courts on 04/02/2020 at 22:30:02 (UTC).

KERN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES VS JENNIFER MELENDEZ AKA JENNIFER MELENDEZ ZUNIGA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 KERN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JENNIFER MELENDEZ AKA JENNIFER MELENDEZ ZUNIGA. This case was filed in Kern County Superior Courts, Metropolitan Branch located in Kern, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Etienne, Linda S.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3035

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Kern County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Metropolitan Branch

  • County, State:

    Kern, California

Judge Details

Judge

Etienne, Linda S.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KERN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES

Defendant

JENNIFER MELENDEZ AKA JENNIFER MELENDEZ ZUNIGA

 

Court Documents

Small Claims Trial

Small Claims Trial 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held; Parties Present Plaintiff: KERN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES; Defendant: JENNIFER MELENDEZ AKA JENNIFER MELENDEZ ZUNIGA

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketImage of Archived Documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DispositionDiposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Judgment Type: Dismissal-Entry of Request for Dismissal After Mediation(CS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketMediation Agreement and Order - Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO KERN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES BY ROSE RECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Trial - Small Claims Trial 01/03/2018: Judicial Officer: Etienne, Linda S.; Hearing Time: 9:30 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • DocketCertified Mail Claimed - Comment: AS TO JENNIFER MELENDEZ AKA JENNIFER MELENDEZ ZUNIGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketCivil and Small Claims Documents - Requested By: KERN COUNTY DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES; Served: 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Sent to Defendant by Certified Mail - Comment: AS TO JENNIFER MELENDEZ AKA JENNIFER MELENDEZ ZUNIGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketDeclaration Requesting Certified Service of Claim - Comment: AS TO JENNIFER MELENDEZ AKA JENNIFER MELENDEZ ZUNIGA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear (Small Claims) - Comment: AS TO KCDHS BY JULIE ANDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Defendant - Comment: RETURNED VIA INTEROFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less